IL SB2287 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that upon a petition by citizens, a referendum shall be submitted to the voters to discontinue and abolish that township's township organization and to transfer all the rights, powers, duties, assets, property, liabilities, obligations, and responsibilities of the township organization to the county. Provides that the township officers of any township that is discontinued shall continue as officers of that township until the expiration of the respective terms for which they were elected or appointed. Further provides that a county may retain its form of government after all townships have been dissolved. Amends the Property Tax Code, the Public Health District Act, the Illinois Public Aid Code, and the Illinois Highway Code making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-SINGULAR DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Consolidation |
2016-04-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Consolidation |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-3.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 2-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 2-4006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 25-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 29 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 5-205.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 905 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |