IL SB2356 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the federal No Child Left Behind Act of 2001.
Title
GROW YOUR OWN TEACHER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-007-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25n | Amended Code | Citation Text |