IL SB2507 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pesticide Act. Increases administrative penalties based on stated ranges of total violation points. Provides that beginning January 1, 2021 and each January 1 thereafter, the amounts of administrative penalties shall be adjusted by the Department of Agriculture based on the annual change in the Consumer Price Index. Requires the updated penalty amounts to be made available to the public on the Department's website.
Title
PESTICIDE ACT-PENALTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 60 | 24.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2507&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2507.htm |