IL SB2609 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that notwithstanding any of the provisions of the Code concerning the administration of psychotropic medication and electroconvulsive therapy, psychotropic medication or electroconvulsive therapy may be administered pursuant to a power of attorney for health care under the Powers of Attorney for Health Care Law or a declaration for mental health treatment under the Mental Health Treatment Preference Declaration Act over the objection of the recipient if the recipient has not revoked the power of attorney or declaration for mental health treatment as provided in the relevant statute. Effective immediately.
Title
PSYCHOTROPIC-ELECTROCONVULSIVE
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0710 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-001-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 2-107.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |