IL SB2609 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Firearms Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Firearms Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to include information on how a parent or guardian can safely store any firearms at home where other policies, rules, and standards concerning student conduct are posted and made available to parents and guardians.
Title
SCH CD-SAFE GUN STORAGE INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2609&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2609.htm |