IL SB2682 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
Pending: House Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
Pending: House Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Changes the Act name to the Increasing Representation of Women in Technology Working Group Act (rather than the Increasing Representation of Women in Technology Task Force Act), and makes conforming changes. Modifies the membership of the Working Group. Provides that the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board, in consultation with an Illinois public college or university, shall provide administrative and other support to the Working Group (rather than the State of Illinois Office of Equity providing administrative support and other support). Modifies the duties of the Working Group and the report requirements. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
WOMEN IN TECHNOLOGY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Small Business, Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |