IL SB2704 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that, if a taxpayer is a volunteer member of a county or municipal emergency services and disaster agency, then the taxpayer must serve as a volunteer emergency worker for at least 100 hours during the taxable year. Makes corresponding changes in provisions concerning reports by the Illinois Emergency Management Agency and Office of Homeland Security. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EMERGENCY WORKERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |