IL SB2715 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that all records containing resident, participant, and complainant information collected by the Long Term Care Ombudsman Program are confidential and shall not be disclosed outside of the program without a lawful subpoena or the permission of the State Ombudsman. Permits the State Ombudsman, at his or her discretion, to disclose resident or participant information if it is in the best interest of the resident or participant. Requires the Department on Aging to establish procedures for the disclosure of program records by the State Ombudsman. Provides that the procedures shall prohibit disclosure of a resident's identity in case records unless the resident gives consent.
Title
AGING-OMBUDSMAN PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |