IL SB2725 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that the Comptroller may provide in his or her rules and regulations for periodic transfers, with the approval of the State Treasurer, for use in accordance with the imprest system, subject to the rules and regulations of the Comptroller as respects vouchers, controls, and reports to the Department of Agriculture to pay State Fair competition personnel and entertainment support contracts necessary to provide the entertainment at each State Fair.
Title
STATE COMPTROLLER-STATE FAIR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Government Operations |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2725&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2725.htm |