IL SB2731 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
Pending: House Health Care Licenses Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
Pending: House Health Care Licenses Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Genetic Counselor Licensing Act. Provides that application for licenses shall be made to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation in writing or electronically (rather than in writing) as prescribed by the Department. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall (1) provide a valid address and email address to the Department, which shall serve as the address of record and email address of record, respectively, at the time of application for licensure or renewal of a license; and (2) inform the Department of any change of address of record or email address of record within 14 days after the change either through the Department's website or by contacting the Department's licensure maintenance unit. Provides that no association, limited liability company, professional limited liability company, or partnership (rather than no association or partnership) shall practice genetic counseling unless every member, partner, and employee of the association, limited liability company, professional limited liability company, or partnership who practices genetic counseling or who renders genetic counseling services holds a valid license issued under the Act. Provides that every application for an original license under the Act shall include the applicant's Social Security Number or individual taxpayer identification number. Removes a provision that authorizes the Department to maintain rosters of the names and addresses of all licensees and all persons whose licenses have been suspended, revoked, or denied. Defines "email address of record". Changes references from the "American Board of Medical Genetics" to the "American Board of Medical Genetics and Genomics". Makes conforming changes. Makes grammatical changes. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to provide for the repeal of the Genetic Counselor Licensing Act on January 1, 2030.
Title
GENETIC COUNSELOR LICENSING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 135 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 135 | 135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 135 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |