IL SB2740 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Housing
Pending: House Housing Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 413 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Housing
Pending: House Housing Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 413 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that the board of managers of a condominium must adopt a policy to reasonably accommodate a unit owner who is a person with a disability. Provides that the board of managers must make reasonable efforts to facilitate a resolution between unit owners to provide for accessible parking if the association does not own or otherwise control parking that meets the accessible parking needs of a unit owner who is a person with a disability who requires accessible parking. Provides that the board of managers must adopt a policy no later than 90 days after the effective date of the Act for existing condominiums or 90 days after the date of the election of the initial board of managers under the Act. Provides that all accessible parking spaces constructed or created in accordance with applicable statutes or ordinances must remain part of the common elements for all new construction condominiums and conversion condominiums submitted after the effective date of the Act. Provides that no developer or declarant shall construct, create, or otherwise make parking units or limited common elements of accessible parking spaces. Provides that any rules or regulations adopted by the board of managers for the use of common element accessible parking spaces must provide that a unit owner who is a person with a disability who requires accessible parking has priority over non-disabled unit owners. Requires the board must review a request for accessible parking within 45 days of receipt of the request to do so. Provides that nothing in this Act precludes a disabled person from purchasing a parking unit or a residential unit to which a limited common element parking space is assigned, and no developer or declarant shall refuse to sell a parking unit to a disabled person or assign a limited common element parking space to a residential unit purchased by a disabled person. Provides that if a disabled person purchases a parking unit or a residential unit to which a limited common element parking space is assigned, that unit owner who is a person with a disability who requires accessible parking may request use of a common element accessible parking space in exchange for permitting the association use of that disabled unit owner's parking unit or limited common element parking space.
Title
CONDOS-ACCESSIBLE PARKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |