IL SB2791 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Small Business Economic Incentive Act. Provides that at least 50% of the dollar value of all economic incentives awarded to businesses by the State or by any State agency on or after January 1, 2025 shall be awarded to businesses with 50 or fewer full-time employees. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
SMALL BUSINESS INCENTIVES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2791&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2791.htm |