IL SB2840 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that enterprise zone applicants shall receive a specific score based on whether or not an applicant meets certain criteria (currently, the applicant receives a score based on the extent to which the applicant meets the criteria). Provides that the Enterprise Zone Board shall approve any application that receives at least 200 points, with the exception of a zone that has previously been decertified for cause. Effective immediately.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONES-SCORING
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 655 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 655 | 5.2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 655 | 5.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2840&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2840.htm |