IL SB2849 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. In provisions concerning the regulation of unmanned aircraft systems, provides that nothing in those provisions shall be construed to deny a unit of local government the right to adopt reasonable rules related to the use by a private party of airspace that is above ground level of public property owned or controlled by that unit of local government. Provides that the provisions apply to publicly owned or controlled property that is intended or permitted to be used for recreational or conservation purposes, including, but not limited to, parks, playgrounds, aquatic facilities, wildlife areas, or other recreational facilities. Provides that reasonable rules adopted pursuant to the provisions do not supersede any administrative rules adopted by the Department of Transportation or any federal laws, rules, or regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
UNMANNED AIRCRAFT REGULATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
620 | 5 | 42.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |