IL SB2879 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
Pending: House Police & Fire Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
Pending: House Police & Fire Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Changes the requirement for competitive bidding for fire protection district contracts to contracts over $30,000 (currently, over $20,000).
Title
FIRE DIST-COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 11k | Amended Code | Citation Text |