IL SB2887 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Salaried Board Confirmation Act. Provides that the Senate shall confirm or reject an appointee to any Governor-appointed board that receives a salary from the State within either 30 session days after the person has been appointed by the Governor or 90 calendar days after the person has been appointed by the Governor, whichever occurs first. Provides that failure of the Senate to confirm or reject the person appointed within this time period shall be deemed a rejection of the appointment by the Senate. Provides that an appointee to the board whose name has been withdrawn as a nominee to the board by the Governor is ineligible to serve on the board for a period of 2 years after the date of withdrawal. Effective immediately.
Title
SALARIED BOARD CONFIRMATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Constitutional Amendments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2887&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2887.htm |