IL SB2894 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure in relation to short sales of property. Provides that, if an offer to purchase either a mortgage or residential property is made by an entity with a tax-exempt filing status under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code or an entity that controls, is controlled by, or is under common control with an entity with such tax-exempt filing status, no mortgagee may require, as a condition of sale or transfer to any such entity, any affidavit, statement, agreement, or addendum limiting ownership or occupancy of the residential property by the mortgagor and, if obtained, the affidavit, statement, agreement, or addendum does not provide a basis to avoid a sale or transfer nor is it enforceable against the acquiring entity or any real estate broker, mortgagor, or settlement agent named in the affidavit, statement, or addendum. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-SHORT SALE RESALE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1401.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2894&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2894.htm |