IL SB2907 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Job Training and Workforce Development Transparency Act. Provides that, within 6 months after the effective date of the Act, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, in coordination with relevant State agencies, shall compile a report concerning all State-funded job training and workforce development programs in the State. Provides that the report shall identify each State-funded job training and workforce development program in the State and provide specified information about each program. Provides that the Department shall collaborate with relevant State agencies to ensure the timely and accurate collection of information required for the report. Provides that the Department shall submit the report to the General Assembly and make the report accessible to the public on the Department's website no later than 6 months after the effective date of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
JOB TRAINING TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |