IL SB2930 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
Pending: House Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
Pending: House Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that the aggregated demographic information of the corporation's directors and officers shall be accessible on the corporation's publicly available website for at least 3 years after it is posted. Removes a provision requiring the Secretary of State to include data fields on its annual report form that allows a corporation to report, at its discretion, the aggregated demographic information of its directors and officers, including race, ethnicity, gender, disability status, veteran status, sexual orientation, and gender identity. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
NOT FOR PROFIT-DEMOGRAPHICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |