IL SB2933 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
Pending: House Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
Pending: House Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice within the meaning of the Act for a consumer reporting agency: (1) to make, create, or furnish any consumer report or credit report containing, incorporating, or reflecting any adverse information that the consumer reporting agency knows or should know relates to medical debt incurred by the consumer or a collection action against the consumer to collect medical debt; and (2) to maintain in the file on a consumer any information relating to medical debt incurred by a consumer or a collection action against the consumer to collect medical debt.
Title
MEDICAL DEBT REPORTING-FRAUD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 005-002-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |