IL SB2946 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Technology Development Act. Removes a provision specifying that the investment of the State Treasurer in any fund created by an Illinois venture capital firm in which the State Treasurer places money shall not exceed 10% of the total investments in the fund. Provides that distributions from a TDA II-Recipient Fund, in an amount not to exceed the commitment amount and total distributions received, may be reinvested into a specified account without being counted against the 5% cap. Provides that specified moneys in the Technology Development Fund may be provided as grants to technology businesses in order to foster, accelerate, and scale technology innovation in Illinois. Modifies the term "technology business" to expand the meaning of technology oriented or emerging activity. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TECH DEV ACCT-GRANT AUTHORITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 265 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 265 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 265 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2946&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2946.htm |