IL SB3062 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Family Practice Residency Act. Changes the short title to the Family Practice and Behavioral Health Promotion Act (and amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Nurses in Advancement Law, the Private Medical Scholarship Agreement Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to reflect that change). Makes changes to the definition of "Designated Shortage Area". Provides that the Department of Public Health shall have the power and duty to allocate funds to behavioral health care programs, to include in its scholarship program the award of behavioral health care professional scholarships, and to include eligible behavioral health care professionals in its educational loan repayment program. Adds representatives of behavioral health care programs to the advisory committee. Provides that funding for family practice residency programs may not be diverted or diminished below fiscal year 2015 funding levels to fund behavioral health care programs. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 935 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 935 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 3.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 3.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 3.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 935 | 3.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 935 | 4.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 4.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 4.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 935 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 970 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 980 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 55.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.24a | Amended Code | Citation Text |