IL SB3111 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Provides that a license that is valid for a period of 2 years shall be issued to a licensee upon application for renewal if certain criteria have been met by the licensee (now, the applicant must not only meet the criteria but also must have its application approved by the Department of Public Health). Effective immediately.
Title
ASSISTED LIVING-LICENSE RENEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 9 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |