IL SB3157 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the State Treasurer may establish an electronic payment processing program to supplement and enhance secure electronic payment options otherwise available to not-for-profit corporations in the State. Provides that the State Treasurer may receive funds paid into the non-profit investment pool by a not-for-profit corporation that is exempt from taxation under Section 501(c)(3), 501(c)(4), or 501(c)(6) of the Internal Revenue Code (rather than Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code).
Title
NON-PROFIT INVESTMENT POOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 005-002-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 505 | 17.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 237 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |