IL SB3180 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Labor Law. Provides for the amount of time a child performer who works in a television, motion picture, or related entertainment production may be permitted to be at the place of employment within a 24-hour time period, based on the age of the performer. Sets forth time requirements for work, rest and recreation, and education. Defines "studio teacher".
Title
CHILD PERFORMERS-HOUR REQS
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Margaret Croke [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 016-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |