IL SB3268 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on January 1, 2025, or as soon thereafter as practical, the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the remaining balance from the Electronic Health Record Incentive Fund into the Public Aid Recoveries Trust Fund. Provides that upon completion of the transfer, the Electronic Health Record Incentive Fund is dissolved, and any future deposits due to that Fund and any outstanding obligations or liabilities of that Fund shall pass to the Public Aid Recoveries Trust Fund. Provides that on January 1, 2026, or as soon thereafter as practical, the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the remaining balance from the Juvenile Rehabilitation Services Medicaid Matching Fund into the Public Aid Recoveries Trust Fund. Provides that upon completion of the transfer, the Juvenile Rehabilitation Services Medicaid Matching Fund is dissolved, and any future deposits due to that Fund and any outstanding obligations or liabilities of that Fund shall pass to the Public Aid Recoveries Trust Fund. Repeals a provision requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to conduct annual audits of the County Provider Trust Fund to determine that amounts received from or paid to county providers were correct. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that on January 1, 2025, or as soon thereafter as practical, the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the remaining balance from the Provider Inquiry Trust Fund into the Healthcare Provider Relief Fund. Provides that upon completion of the transfer, the Provider Inquiry Trust Fund is dissolved, and any future deposits due to that Fund and any outstanding obligations or liabilities of that Fund shall pass to the Healthcare Provider Relief Fund. Repeals provisions in the Illinois Public Aid Code concerning the Medicaid Research and Education Support Fund and enhancement payments for Medicaid research and education. Repeals the Supportive Living Facility Funding Article and the Supportive Living Facility Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-FUND TRANSFERS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.481 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.797 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.836 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.856 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-10.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-10.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 15-6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-31 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-32 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | Art. V-G | Repealed Code | Citation Text |