IL SB3288 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act. Defines "research" to have the meaning that is ascribed to it in HIPAA and the Code of Federal Regulations. Provides that records and communications may be disclosed for research in accordance with the requirements set forth under HIPAA and the Code of Federal Regulations.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH-RESEARCH
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 110 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 110 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |