IL SB3311 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that each park authority or its designee shall test each source of potable water in each of its public buildings and parks and notify the public of the results. Provides requirements for testing and notification. Provides requirements for requests seeking waiver of testing. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall conduct hearings and impose civil penalties in relation to violations of the provisions concerning lead testing in parks. Provides that schools constructed on or before January 1, 2014 shall conduct testing for lead in water and submit samples to the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency. Amends the Illinois Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall accept and analyze drinking water samples collected under those provisions of the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that the Agency shall collect a fee for each sample accepted for analysis.
Title
LEAD IN DRINKING WATER-PARKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 320 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 29.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 320 | 35.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 35.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 320 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 17.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3311&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3311.htm |