IL SB3326 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Adds reference to horizontal drilling with fracturing operations. Adds provisions concerning a county board or governing body's approval or denial for a request to consent for a local siting of a well site and operations. Makes other changes to provisions concerning permit applications, public notice, and public comment periods.
Title
HYDRAULIC FRAC-LOCAL CONSENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 732 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3326&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3326.htm |