IL SB3330 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Adds references to "horizontal drilling with fracturing operations" alongside "high volume horizontal hydraulic fracturing". Makes changes in required information included in applications for permits. Provides that the chemical disclosure information required by the Act shall be submitted at the time of permit application. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall add the updated contents of the fluid used in any and all well treatments to the public chemical disclose lists and to the medical and emergency use chemical disclosure lists for the respective wells no later than 24 hours from the time of receiving the updated information. Provides that the provision protecting trade secrets concerning chemical disclosure under the Act shall not apply to the requests for information from the medical and emergency health care community.
Title
FRACKING-CHEMICAL DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 732 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |