IL SB3350 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that specified hospitals and other organizations deemed eligible by the Department of Public Health shall be enrolled to receive fentanyl test strips from the Department and distribute fentanyl test strips upon enrollment in the Drug Overdose Prevention Program. Removes a provision requiring every law enforcement agency and fire department that responds to emergency medical calls to possess fentanyl test strips and to distribute fentanyl test strips to the public at no charge. Removes a provision requiring every health care facility to possess fentanyl test strips and to make available fentanyl test strips to the public. Provides that the needle and hypodermic syringe access program shall provide access to fentanyl test strips if feasible.
Title
FENTANYL TEST STRIPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 5-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 710 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |