IL SB3363 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the unlawful use of weapons provisions prohibiting a person, with certain exceptions, from carrying or possessing a firearm in any vehicle or concealed on or about his or her person, upon any public street, alley, or other public lands within the corporate limits of a city, village or incorporated town and the aggravated unlawful use of a weapon provisions do not apply to retired parole agents and retired parole supervisors who receive training in the use of firearms conducted by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board and are certified as having successfully completing the training by the Board and who requalify for the firearms training annually at a State range certified by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board. Requires the retired parole agent or retired parole supervisor to have left his or her employment with the Department of Corrections in good standing and not subject to involuntary discharge or dismissal. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS-RETIRED PAROLE AGENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3363&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3363.htm |