IL SB3434 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Authorizes the Illinois Emergency Management Agency and office of Homeland Security to adopt rules for the implementation of its State-funded grant programs.
Title
IEMA-OHS-GRANT PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 005-003-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |