IL SB3448 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Planning and Community Right to Know Act. Requires State agencies to verify addresses of locations of Tier II chemicals before providing Tier II chemical address information to local agencies.
Title
IEMA-ADDRESS VERIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 100 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |