IL SB3530 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0811
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0811
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "former military vehicle" as a vehicle or trailer, regardless of size, weight, or year of manufacture, that was manufactured for use in any country's military forces and is maintained to depict or represent military design or markings, and does not include a vehicle used for any commercial or production agriculture purpose. Provides that the owner of a former military vehicle may register the vehicle for a fee not to exceed $100 for a vehicle with a gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or less; $150 for a vehicle with a gross vehicle weight rating of over 26,000 pounds; $25 for a trailer with a weight of 3,000 pounds or less; or $75 for a trailer with a weight of over 3,000 pounds. Provides that the Secretary of State may prescribe that former military vehicle plates be issued for a definite or an indefinite term, such term to correspond to the term of registration plates issued generally as provided by law. Provides that any person requesting former military vehicle plates may also apply to have vanity or personalized plates. Provides that a vehicle registered as a former military vehicle is not subject to weight tax requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-FORMER MILITARY REGISTR
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Dave Winters [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0811 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date July 13, 2012 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001 |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-123.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |