IL SB3539 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
Pending: Senate Paid Leave Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
Pending: Senate Paid Leave Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Paid Leave for All Workers Act. Provides that the definition of "employee" does not include an election judge or a short-term worker hired to oversee and facilitate elections.
Title
PAID LEAVE FOR ALL-EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Faraci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Paid Leave |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 192 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3539&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3539.htm |