IL SB3575 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision that sets forth the basic amount of the standard exemption for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2023 and prior to December 31, 2024, and restores the cost-of-living adjustment for the basic amount that had been operative before the effective date of Public Act 103-9. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STANDARD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3575&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3575.htm |