IL SB3620 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Beginning in levy year 2010, requires the county clerk to calculate separate limiting rates for (i) community mental health funds, (ii) funds for persons with a developmental disability, and (iii) the aggregate of all other county or township funds, regardless of whether or not the county or township community mental health board or the county or township board for care and treatment of persons with a developmental disability has submitted a written request. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-MENTAL HEALTH FUNDS-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3620&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3620.htm |