IL SB3631 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Coordinate System Act of 2024. Creates the Illinois Coordinate System Committee. Provides that the Committee shall create, review, and revise the Guide to the Illinois Coordinate System. Requires the Committee to meet at the call of any designated member of the Committee. Requires the Committee to adopt an organizational structure as necessary for the fulfillment of its purpose. Specifies the members required to form the Committee. Requires the Committee to engage with interested stakeholders throughout the State representing local, regional, State, and federal agencies, professional associations, academic institutions, and private sector companies, enterprises, and businesses. Sets forth provisions concerning the purpose of the Act, definitions, and the Guide to the Illinois Coordinate System. Repeals the Illinois Coordinate System Act.
Title
ILLINOIS COORDINATE SYSTEM ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 225 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |