IL SB3636 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires a hospital to provide a plan of correction to the Department of Public Health within 60 days if the hospital demonstrates a pattern or practice of failing to substantially comply with specified requirements or with the hospital's written staffing plan. Allows the Department to impose specified fines on a hospital for failing to comply with written staffing plans for nursing services or plans of correction. Requires money from fines to be deposited into the Hospital Licensure Fund (instead of the Long Term Care Provider Fund). Contains provisions concerning staffing plans. Amends the Nursing Education Scholarship Law. Provides that the Department of Public Health may award a total of $500,000 annually in nursing education scholarships. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who are employed during the taxable year as nurse educators. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 2.5% of the taxpayer's federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year. Effective immediately, except that provisions amending the Hospital Licensing Act take effect on the first day of the first full calendar month that begins 6 months after the Act becomes law.
Title
REVENUE-NURSE EDUCATORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 975 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 10.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 14.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3636&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3636.htm |