IL SB3652 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Housing
Pending: House Housing Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 413 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Housing
Pending: House Housing Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Room 413 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Summary of Rights for Safer Homes Act. Requires the Department of Human Rights to create a summary form advising tenants who have suffered domestic violence or sexual violence of the rights that they have under Illinois law that provide protection in their ability to have safe housing. Requires landlords to attach a copy of the summary as the first page of any written residential lease entered into with a tenant.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE-REMEDIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |