IL SB3671 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Deletes the requirement that the Department of Veterans Affairs conduct an annual review that compares benefits received by Illinois veterans with the benefits received by veterans in all other states and U.S. territories. Provides that if the Department determines that the appropriations for the purposes of the provision concerning the Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Outpatient Counseling Program are not sufficient to support all of the requirements of that provision, then the Department shall have the discretion to provide only those services set forth in that provision that the Department determines the appropriation can support. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS-DEPT REVIEW-SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0765 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Effective Date July 6, 2012 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Armed Forces & Military Affairs Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Armed Forces & Military Affairs Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2805 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |