IL SB3676 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Requires every voting member of the governing board of a public university to complete professional development leadership training covering, among other topics, equity and student success. Amends the Public Community College Act. Requires every voting member of the board of trustees of a community college to complete professional development leadership training covering, among other topics, equity and student success.
Title
EDU-BOARD LEADERSHIP TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3676&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3676.htm |