IL SB3691 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Family Caregiver Act. Provides, in a provision concerning the Department on Aging's contract with area agencies on aging, that services under the Act must be provided according to the requirements of State and federal law and rules (rather than according to the requirements of federal law and rules, except for the provision of services to grandparents or older individuals who are relative caregivers when State funding is utilized to provide those services).
Title
AGING-FAMILY CAREGIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 65 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |