IL SB3701 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that each prescriber or his or her designee shall document an attempt to access patient information in the Prescription Monitoring Program to assess patient access to controlled substances when providing a prescription for a Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substance (rather than an initial prescription for Schedule II narcotics such as opioids), except for prescriptions for oncology treatment or palliative care, or a 7-day or less supply provided by a hospital emergency department when treating an acute, traumatic medical condition. Provides that as a condition of licensure and license renewal, all prescribers holding an Illinois Controlled Substance license through the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall have an Illinois Prescription Monitoring Program account.
Title
CONT SUB-RX MONITORING PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-003-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 314.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |