IL SB3739 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act. Adds definitions. Provides that the minimum ratio for each provider type shall be no less than any such ratio established for qualified health plans in Federally-Facilitated Exchanges by federal law or by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Provides that the maximum travel time and distance standards and appointment wait time standards shall be no greater than any such standards established for qualified health plans in Federally-Facilitated Exchanges by federal law or by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Makes changes to provisions concerning network adequacy, notice of nonrenewal or termination, transition of services, network transparency, administration and enforcement, provider requirements, and provider directory information. Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Makes changes to provisions concerning notice of nonrenewal or termination and transition of services. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize the Department of Insurance to adopt emergency rules implementing federal standards for provider ratios, time and distance, or appointment wait times when such standards apply to health insurance coverage regulated by the Department of Insurance and are more stringent than the State standards extant at the time the final federal standards are published. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
NETWORK ADEQUACY-STANDARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this committee amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 124 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 124 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 124 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 124 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 134 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 134 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |