IL SB3768 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Changes references of "deaf-blind" to "deafblind". Provides that the Philip J. Rock Center and School shall service eligible students between the ages of 3 and 21, unless the student's 22nd birthday occurs during the school year, in which case the student is eligible for such services through the end of the school year (instead of providing that the School serves eligible children between the ages of 3 and 22). Removes the requirement that, in accordance with a student's individualized education program, the Philip J. Rock Center and School make every attempt to provide a free appropriate public education pursuant to the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act of 2001 to a student placed in its residential educational facility either in its own program or within a local school district program that is appropriate to the child and contracted for by the Philip J. Rock Center and School. Makes typographical and grammatical corrections.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-DEAF-BLIND
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-11.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |