IL SR0047 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 12 through March 18, 2023 as MS Awareness Week in the State of Illinois and recognizes the importance of finding the cause and cure of MS. Encourages all Illinoisans to learn more about MS.
Title
MS AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 8, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0047.htm |