IL SR0249 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honors all women residing in skilled nursing facilities in Illinois for their lifelong service to their families and communities.
Title
HONOR WOMEN IN FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=249&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0249.htm |