IL SR0265 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 16, 2019 as Illinois Education and Sharing Day.
Title
IL EDUCATION & SHARING DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=265&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0265.htm |